Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0181204
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.11.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
20.02.1992 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] |
10.01.1992 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.1992 [1992/10] |
12.11.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] |
01.11.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.1991 [1991/52] |
11.07.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] |
16.02.1991 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] |
10.03.1990 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.04.1990 [1990/17] |
26.01.1990 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.03.1990 [1990/11] |
26.01.1990 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.03.1990 [1990/11] |
28.03.1988 |
First examination report |
|
07.09.1987 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.10.1987 [1987/44] |
29.04.1987 |
Publication of search report |
published on 16.06.1987 [1987/25] |
28.03.1986 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.05.1986 [1986/20] |