Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE52275T | 15.05.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US66956584 | 08.11.1984 | EP85308074 | 06.11.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU572350B | Global Dossier | 05.05.1988 | B2 | AU4841985 | 15.05.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US66956584 | 08.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0181204 | Global Dossier | 25.04.1990 | B1 | EP0181204 | 16.06.1987 | A3 | EP0181204 | 14.05.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US66956584 | 08.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1240230 | 09.08.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US66956584 | 08.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3577329D1 | 31.05.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US66956584 | 08.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL76180 | 30.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US66956584 | 08.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS61115999 | 03.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US66956584 | 08.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4579681 | 01.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US66956584 | 08.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA856865 | 25.06.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | US66956584 | 08.11.1984 |