EP0181204 - Laundry detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAF CHEMICALS CORPORATION 1361 Alps Road Wayne New Jersey 07470 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states GAF CHEMICALS CORPORATION 1361 Alps Road Wayne New Jersey 07470 / US | ||
Former [1986/20] | For all designated states GAF CORPORATION 1361 Alps Road Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruppert, Ronald M. 8 Sova Place Moonachie New Jersey 07074 / US | 02 /
Savio, Lenore E. 1030 Westbrook Road West Milford New Jersey 07480 / US | [1986/20] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308074.5 | 06.11.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | US19840669565 | 08.11.1984 Original published format: US 669565 | [1986/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0181204 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0181204 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181204 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D3/22 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
C11D3/0036 (EP,US);
C11D3/28 (US);
C11D3/3769 (EP,US);
C11D3/3776 (EP,US);
C11D3/3788 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/20] | Title | German: | Wäschereinigungsmittel | [1986/20] | English: | Laundry detergent composition | [1986/20] | French: | Composition détergente pour le linge | [1986/20] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 30.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.11.1990 | GB | 06.11.1990 | SE | 07.11.1990 | BE | 30.11.1990 | CH | 30.11.1990 | LI | 30.11.1990 | LU | 30.11.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/15] | AT | 06.11.1990 | |
GB | 06.11.1990 | ||
SE | 07.11.1990 | ||
BE | 30.11.1990 | ||
CH | 30.11.1990 | ||
LI | 30.11.1990 | ||
Former [1992/10] | GB | 06.11.1990 | |
SE | 07.11.1990 | ||
BE | 30.11.1990 | ||
CH | 30.11.1990 | ||
LI | 30.11.1990 | ||
Former [1992/01] | GB | 06.11.1990 | |
SE | 07.11.1990 | ||
CH | 30.11.1990 | ||
LI | 30.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/52] | GB | 06.11.1990 | |
SE | 07.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/35] | SE | 07.11.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2237960 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [A]US4020015 (BEVAN GEOFFREY); | [A]US4088610 (BEVAN GEOFFREY, et al); | [X]EP0087671 (BASF AG [DE]) |