EP0181231 - Thermally-induced hydrolysis of acetal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE HALCON SD GROUP, INC. 2 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10016 / US | [1986/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rizkalla, Nabil 415 Faletti Circle River Vale New Jersey 07675 / US | [1986/20] | Representative(s) | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | [1986/20] | Application number, filing date | 85308136.2 | 08.11.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | US19840669708 | 09.11.1984 Original published format: US 669708 | [1986/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181231 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C47/06, C07C31/04, C07C27/00 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
C07C45/515 (EP,US);
C07C29/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/10, C07C31/04 (US,EP);
C07C45/515, C07C47/06 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/20] | Title | German: | Thermisch induzierte Hydrolyse von Acetalen | [1986/20] | English: | Thermally-induced hydrolysis of acetal | [1986/20] | French: | Hydrolyse d'acétals induite par chaleur | [1986/20] | File destroyed: | 23.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 15.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/29] | 13.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0040715 [ ] (BASF AG [DE]); | DE3339973 [ ] (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) |