EP0188069 - Iron oxide catalysts containing copper and zinc compounds and process for dehydrogenating para-ethyltoluene using such catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.1989 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burress, George Thomas 80 Claire Drive Bridgewater New Jersey 08807 / US | [1986/30] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John Anthony, et al Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | [1987/06] |
Former [1986/30] | West, Alan Harry Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308173.5 | 08.11.1985 | [1986/30] | Priority number, date | US19840681968 | 14.12.1984 Original published format: US 681968 | [1986/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0188069 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/86, C07C15/46, C07C5/333 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
B01J23/868 (EP,US);
B01J23/005 (EP,US);
C07C5/3332 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/3332, C07C15/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/30] | Title | German: | Kupfer- und Zinkverbindungen enthaltende Eisenoxidkatalysatoren und Verfahren zur Dehydrierung von Paraäthyltoluol mittels dieser Katalysatoren | [1986/30] | English: | Iron oxide catalysts containing copper and zinc compounds and process for dehydrogenating para-ethyltoluene using such catalysts | [1986/30] | French: | Catalyseurs d'oxyde de fer contenant des composés du cuivre et du zinc et procédé pour déshydrogéner le paraéthyltoluène utilisant de tels catalyseurs | [1986/30] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 20.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/04] | 21.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/29] | 15.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1542074 [ ]; | FR2322116 [ ] (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | US4152300 [ ] (RIESSER GREGOR H [US]); | EP0093518 [ ] (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]); | EP0112017 [ ] (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) |