EP0182564 - Infrared spectrophotometric apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIELDS INSTRUMENTS LIMITED Wheldrake York Y04 6NA / GB | [1986/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shields, John c/o Shields Instruments Limited Wheldrake York Y04 6NA / GB | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road Bradford BD1 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308178.4 | 11.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | GB19840028660 | 13.11.1984 Original published format: GB 8428660 | GB19850009875 | 17.04.1985 Original published format: GB 8509875 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0182564 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0182564 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182564 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, G01N21/03, G01N21/31, G01N33/04 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
G01N33/04 (EP,US);
G01N21/3577 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3129 (EP,US);
G01N21/0332 (EP,US);
G01N21/314 (EP,US);
G01N2201/126 (EP,US);
G01N2201/12753 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/22] | Title | German: | Infrarot-spektrophotometrische Vorrichtung | [1986/22] | English: | Infrared spectrophotometric apparatus | [1986/22] | French: | Appareil pour la spectrophotométrie en infrarouge | [1986/22] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/11: Teilanmeldung 90115140.7 eingereicht am 11/11/85 | EPB 1991/11: Divisional application 90115140.7 filed on 11/11/85 | EPB 1991/11: Demande divisionnaire 90115140.7 déposée le 11/11/85 | Examination procedure | 09.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 27.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP90115140.7 / EP0404207 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.02.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.03.1991 | BE | 13.03.1991 | CH | 13.03.1991 | LI | 13.03.1991 | SE | 13.03.1991 | LU | 30.11.1991 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/10] | AT | 13.03.1991 | |
BE | 13.03.1991 | ||
CH | 13.03.1991 | ||
LI | 13.03.1991 | ||
SE | 13.03.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 13.03.1991 | |
CH | 13.03.1991 | ||
LI | 13.03.1991 | ||
SE | 13.03.1991 | ||
Former [1992/01] | CH | 13.03.1991 | |
LI | 13.03.1991 | ||
SE | 13.03.1991 | ||
Former [1991/43] | SE | 13.03.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2365605 ; | [A]GB2000283 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE); | [A]DE2810117 (INTERATOM); | [AD]US4310763 (SHIELDS JOHN) |