EP0182603 - Alkanesulfonate derivatives useful as an insecticide, acaricide and nematicide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0071 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | For all designated states NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Shoichi 309-2 Hirakataryoryoke Ageo-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Shimano, Shizuo 2-11-23 Kami-cho Ageo-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Hayaoka, Tatsumi 4255-2 Hirakata Ageo-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Masui, Akio 1-14 Minaminakano Omiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308271.7 | 13.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | JP19840240150 | 14.11.1984 Original published format: JP 24015084 | JP19850106995 | 21.05.1985 Original published format: JP 10699585 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0182603 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0182603 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/70, C07D213/71, A01N43/40 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
C07D213/70 (EP,US);
C07D213/64 (KR);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
C07D213/71 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1986/22] | Title | German: | Als Insektizide, Acaricide und Nematicide verwendbare Alkansulfonatderivate | [1986/22] | English: | Alkanesulfonate derivatives useful as an insecticide, acaricide and nematicide | [1986/22] | French: | Dérivés alcanesulfonate utiles comme insecticide, acaricide et nématicide | [1986/22] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 20.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/33] | 24.03.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP48098025 ; | [YP]JP60158162 ; | [Y]GB1079400 (BAYER AG); | [A]US3829430 (KYRIACOU D); | [A]US3549647 (JOHNSTON HOWARD) | [YD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, 1974, page 152, abstract no. 34590e, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-48 098 025 (NIPPON KAYAKU CO. LTD) 13-12-1973, & JP48098025 A 00000000 | [YP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, 1986, page 527, abstract no. 33858e, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-60 158 162 (NIPPON KAYAKU CO. LTD) 19-08-1985, & JP60158162 A 00000000 |