EP0183478 - Glycidol modified succinimides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEVRON RESEARCH COMPANY 555 Market Street San Francisco California 94120 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states CHEVRON RESEARCH COMPANY 555 Market Street San Francisco California 94120 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plavac, Frank 152 H Lane Novato California 94947 / US | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | Kosmin, Gerald Emmanuel, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | Kosmin, Gerald Emmanuel, et al HASELTINE, LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308430.9 | 20.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | US19840673962 | 21.11.1984 Original published format: US 673962 | [1986/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0183478 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0183478 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183478 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C10M133/16, C10M133/56, C10L1/22, // (C10N30/04, 60:00) | [1986/23] | CPC: |
C10M133/56 (EP,US);
C08F8/02 (EP,US);
C08F8/48 (EP,US);
C10L1/224 (EP,US);
C10L1/2383 (EP,US);
C10M133/16 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10M2227/061 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
C10N2040/255 (EP,US);
C10N2040/28 (EP,US);
C10N2070/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/02, C08F8/32, C08F8/48, C08F8/32, C08F110/10 (US,EP);
C08F8/02, C08F8/48, C08F8/32, C08F110/10 (US,EP);
C08F8/48, C08F8/32, C08F110/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/23] | Title | German: | Mit Glycidol modofizierte Succinimide | [1986/23] | English: | Glycidol modified succinimides | [1986/23] | French: | Succinimides modifiés avec glycidole | [1986/23] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 20.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1443981 (SOCONY MOBIL OIL CO); | [A]US4353711 (CHILDS MICHAEL E); | [A]EP0119675 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) |