EP0186963 - Pretreatment for electroplating mineral-filled nylon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.1987 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/28] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Sonya Wu 3874 Anvil Drive Troy Michigan 48083 / US | 02 /
Lindsay, James Hoatson 12079 Jeffers Lane Fenton Michigan 48430 / US | [1986/28] | Representative(s) | Haines, Arthur Donald, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/28] | Haines, Arthur Donald, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308451.5 | 20.11.1985 | [1986/28] | Priority number, date | US19840684268 | 20.12.1984 Original published format: US 684268 | [1986/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186963 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/28] | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/56, // C23C14/00 | [1986/28] | CPC: |
C25D5/56 (EP,US);
C23C28/023 (EP,US);
Y10S205/918 (EP,US);
Y10S205/926 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/28] | Title | German: | Vorbehandlung zum Elektroplattieren von Mineralfüllstoff enthaltendem Nylon | [1986/28] | English: | Pretreatment for electroplating mineral-filled nylon | [1986/28] | French: | Prétraitement pour l'électroplacage d'un nylon chargé avec des matières minérales | [1986/28] | File destroyed: | 23.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 12.05.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |