EP0184355 - Improvements in or relating to a process for purifying proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Michele Ceceil 2040 Landmark Street Apartment 810 Indianapolis Indiana 46260 / US | 02 /
Pidgeon, Charles 490 West Linden Street Zionsville Indiana 46077 / US | [1986/24] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308471.3 | 21.11.1985 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | US19840678602 | 05.12.1984 Original published format: US 678602 | [1986/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0184355 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0184355 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184355 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07K17/02, C07K1/14, C07K3/20 | [1986/24] | CPC: |
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
B01J20/223 (EP,US);
B01J20/286 (EP,US);
B01J20/3212 (EP,US);
B01J20/3265 (EP,US);
C07K1/22 (EP,US);
B01J2220/49 (EP,US);
B01J2220/54 (EP,US);
B01J2220/58 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Proteinen | [1986/24] | English: | Improvements in or relating to a process for purifying proteins | [1986/24] | French: | Procédé de purification des protéines | [1986/24] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/24] | 01.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 22.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/53] | Request for further processing for: | 19.05.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2097279 [ ] (HEALTH LAB SERVICE BOARD); | US4476116 [ ] (ANIK SHABBIR T [US]); | EP0122969 [ ] (LEPETIT SPA [IT]) | Examination | EP0121352 |