Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0183533 | Global Dossier | 23.03.1988 | A3 | EP0183533 | 04.06.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP24989084 | 27.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1272207 | 31.07.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24989084 | 27.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0517927B | 10.03.1993 | B2 | JPS61127733 | 16.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24989084 | 27.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4616076 | 07.10.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24989084 | 27.11.1984 |