EP0188088 - Servo controlling circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshio, Junichi Pioneer Electronic Corporation Tokorozawa Works No. 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama / JP | [1986/30] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85309003.3 | 11.12.1985 | [1986/30] | Priority number, date | JP19840262491 | 11.12.1984 Original published format: JP 26249184 | [1986/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0188088 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/095, G11B19/24 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
G11B21/106 (EP);
G11B19/28 (EP);
G11B7/0948 (EP);
G11B7/0903 (EP);
G11B7/0908 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/30] | Title | German: | Servosteuerungsschaltung | [1986/30] | English: | Servo controlling circuit | [1986/30] | French: | Circuit de servocommande | [1986/30] | File destroyed: | 23.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 12.03.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |