blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0186422

EP0186422 - Emitter coupled logic bipolar memory cells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.1990
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/27]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Thomas, Mammen
1081 Corvette Drive
San Jose California 95129 / US
02 / Ko, Wen C.
6948 Craywood
San Jose California 95120 / US
[1986/27]
Representative(s)Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al
Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells
Kent TN4 8EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/27]Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al
BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date85309203.917.12.1985
[1986/27]
Priority number, dateUS1984068328718.12.1984         Original published format: US 683287
[1986/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0186422
Date:02.07.1986
Language:EN
[1986/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1986
ClassificationIPC:H01L27/10, G11C11/40
[1986/27]
CPC:
H01L21/28537 (EP,US); H10B10/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/27]
TitleGerman:Bipolare ECL-Speicherzellen[1986/27]
English:Emitter coupled logic bipolar memory cells[1986/27]
French:Mémoire bipolaire utilisant des cellules logiques à émetteurs couplés[1986/27]
File destroyed:17.06.1996
Examination procedure11.12.1986Examination requested  [1987/10]
05.08.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.08.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.08.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/20]
21.12.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1990/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.01.199005   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2183708  (IBM [US]);
 [A]EP0055347  (IBM [US]);
 [Y]EP0095411  (FAIRCHILD CAMERA INSTR CO [US])
 [Y]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 5, October 1983, pages 2569-2573, New York, US; H.H. CHAO et al.: "Simple fabrication technique to implement a buried N-type grid under a memory array for protection against radiation-induced soft-errors"
 [A]  - IEEE INTERNATIONAL E.D.M., 10th December 1980, pages 50-53, IEEE, New York, US; J. MIYAMOTO et al.: "Application of polycrystalline silicon load for high performance bipolar memory"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.