Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2575840 | 12.06.1987 | B2 | FR2575840 | 11.07.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR8400257 | 10.01.1984 | FR8500080 | 04.01.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8503141 | Global Dossier | 18.07.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8400257 | 10.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0148803 | Global Dossier | 01.03.1989 | B1 | EP0148803 | 17.07.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8400257 | 10.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3568502D1 | 06.04.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8400257 | 10.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2557985 | 24.04.1987 | B1 | FR2557985 | 12.07.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8400257 | 10.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS61502423 | 23.10.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8400257 | 10.01.1984 |