EP0149582 - Process for the preparation of aspartyl peptides and derivatives of aspartic acid useful in their synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOCHEM 10, rue Clément Marot 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states ISOCHEM (société anonyme) 10, rue Clément Marot F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wirth, Didier 3, place du Palais Bourbon F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Gibert, Dominique 12, rue de l'Eglise F-60340 Villers-S/Saint-Leu / FR | 03 /
Boutin, Annie 3, place André Malraux F-92390 Villeneuve-La-Garenne / FR | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | L'Helgoualch, Jean, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | L'Helgoualch, Jean, et al Cabinet Sueur et L'Helgoualch 78, rue Carnot F-95240 Cormeilles-en-Parisis / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400084.1 | 18.01.1985 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | FR19840000794 | 19.01.1984 Original published format: FR 8400794 | FR19840015280 | 05.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8415280 | [1985/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149582 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149582 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0149582 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, C07C101/22 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
C07K5/0613 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Aspartylpeptiden und bei deren Synthese gebrauchte Derivate von Aspartinsäure | [1985/30] | English: | Process for the preparation of aspartyl peptides and derivatives of aspartic acid useful in their synthesis | [1985/30] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'aspartyl peptides et nouveaux dérivés de l'acide aspartique utilisables dans leur synthèse | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 10.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/24] | 25.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.1988 | IT | 18.05.1988 | NL | 18.05.1988 | GB | 23.11.1988 | SE | 19.01.1989 | BE | 31.01.1989 | CH | 31.01.1989 | LI | 31.01.1989 | LU | 31.01.1989 | [2000/03] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 18.05.1988 | |
IT | 18.05.1988 | ||
NL | 18.05.1988 | ||
SE | 19.01.1989 | ||
BE | 31.01.1989 | ||
CH | 31.01.1989 | ||
LI | 31.01.1989 | ||
LU | 31.01.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 18.05.1988 | |
IT | 18.05.1988 | ||
NL | 18.05.1988 | ||
SE | 19.01.1989 | ||
BE | 31.01.1989 | ||
CH | 31.01.1989 | ||
LI | 31.01.1989 | ||
Former [1990/16] | AT | 18.05.1988 | |
NL | 18.05.1988 | ||
SE | 19.01.1989 | ||
BE | 31.01.1989 | ||
CH | 31.01.1989 | ||
LI | 31.01.1989 | ||
Former [1989/43] | AT | 18.05.1988 | |
NL | 18.05.1988 | ||
SE | 19.01.1989 | ||
BE | 31.01.1989 | ||
Former [1989/39] | AT | 18.05.1988 | |
NL | 18.05.1988 | ||
BE | 31.01.1989 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 18.05.1988 | |
NL | 18.05.1988 | ||
Former [1989/11] | NL | 18.05.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0035047 ; | [X]US4332718 ; | [X]DE1143516 ; | [A]EP0048345 ; | [E]EP0099960 | [A] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, no. 7, 1979, pages 613-616, Pergamon Press, GB; J. TSUJI et al.: "A convenient method for the preparation of 1-olefins by the palladium catalyzed hydrogenolysis of allylic acetates and allylic phenyl ethers with ammonium formate" |