blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0156671

EP0156671 - Cistern water cooling and purification device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.1986
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIESEL ENERGIE
115, rue du Fossé Blanc
F- 92234 Gennevilliers / FR
[1985/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Gaches, Alain
4, rue de Verdun
F-78590 Noisy le Roi / FR
[1985/40]
Representative(s)Loyer, Yves, et al
CABINET PIERRE LOYER 18, rue de Mogador
F-75009 Paris / FR
[1985/40]
Application number, filing date85400273.015.02.1985
[1985/40]
Priority number, dateFR1984000241117.02.1984         Original published format: FR 8402411
[1985/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0156671
Date:02.10.1985
Language:FR
[1985/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.1985
ClassificationIPC:C02F9/00, E03C1/00, F25D7/00
[1985/40]
CPC:
E03B1/02 (EP); C02F1/283 (EP); C02F1/32 (EP);
C02F2103/02 (EP); C02F2201/008 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/40]
TitleGerman:Kühlungs- und Reinigungsanlage für Zisternenwasser[1985/40]
English:Cistern water cooling and purification device[1985/40]
French:Dispositif de refroidissement et purification d'eau de citerne ou de réserve[1985/40]
File destroyed:16.12.1992
Examination procedure12.06.1986Application withdrawn by applicant  [1986/35]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US1929583  (HALSEY EDWARD S);
 [A]US2488116  (ELLY BERLOWITZ);
 [A]US3196892  (SAVAGE ROBERT H, et al);
 [A]DE2124098  ;
 [A]FR2373860  (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]);
 [A]US4120787  (YARGEAU BRIAN A);
 [A]DE2922735  (MAINTAL KLIMA SERVICE GMBH);
 [A]EP0096377  (ALHAEUSER ERICH)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.