EP0159209 - Emergency container for an accidentally amputated limb [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hales, Patrick 25 allée de la Fontaine au Blanc F-78860 St. Nom la Breteche / FR | For all designated states Laurier, Jean-Pierre Le Moulin de la Bonde F-78121 Crespieres / FR | For all designated states Pradet, Gérard 5 rue des Gate-Ceps 92210 St. Cloud / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states Hales, Patrick 25 allée de la Fontaine au Blanc F-78860 St. Nom la Breteche / FR | ||
For all designated states Laurier, Jean-Pierre Le Moulin de la Bonde F-78121 Crespieres / FR | |||
For all designated states Pradet, Gérard 5 rue des Gate-Ceps F-92210 St. Cloud / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1985/43] | Pinguet, André CAPRI 28 bis, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400319.1 | 21.02.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | FR19840002822 | 24.02.1984 Original published format: FR 8402822 | FR19840017309 | 13.11.1984 Original published format: FR 8417309 | [1985/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159209 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159209 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
F25D3/08 (EP,US);
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
A01N1/0273 (EP,US);
F25D2303/081 (EP,US);
F25D2400/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/43] | Title | German: | Notbehälter für bei Unfällen amputierte Gliedmassen | [1985/43] | English: | Emergency container for an accidentally amputated limb | [1985/43] | French: | Conteneur d'urgence pour membre amputé accidentellement | [1985/43] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 31.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 22.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/22] | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.03.1985 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   24.04.1985 | 21.03.1985 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   24.04.1985 | 21.03.1985 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   24.04.1985 | 21.03.1985 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   24.04.1985 | 21.03.1985 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   24.04.1985 | 21.03.1985 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   24.04.1985 | 21.03.1985 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   24.04.1985 | 21.03.1985 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   24.04.1985 | 21.03.1985 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   24.04.1985 | 21.03.1985 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   24.04.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.1989 | IT | 24.05.1989 | NL | 24.05.1989 | SE | 24.05.1989 | GB | 21.02.1990 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 24.05.1989 | |
IT | 24.05.1989 | ||
NL | 24.05.1989 | ||
SE | 24.05.1989 | ||
GB | 21.02.1990 | ||
Former [1991/11] | AT | 24.05.1989 | |
NL | 24.05.1989 | ||
SE | 24.05.1989 | ||
GB | 21.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/11] | AT | 24.05.1989 | |
NL | 24.05.1989 | ||
SE | 24.05.1989 | ||
Former [1990/09] | AT | 24.05.1989 | |
SE | 24.05.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 24.05.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3810367 (PETERSON W); | [A]DE2949909 (MARX GUENTER H [DE]); | [A]FR2497934 (BENARD MICHEL [FR]) |