EP0156681 - Nut setting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FACOM Société par Actions Simplifiée 6 et 8, rue Gustave Eiffel 91423 Morangis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states FACOM, Société dite: 6 et 8 Rue Gustave Eiffel F-91423 Morangis Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dossier, Michel 12 Rue Singer F-75016 Paris / FR | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400320.9 | 21.02.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | FR19840002888 | 24.02.1984 Original published format: FR 8402888 | [1985/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0156681 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156681 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B25B13/06 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
B25B13/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1985/40] | Title | German: | Bolzenschraubgerät | [1985/40] | English: | Nut setting tool | [1985/40] | French: | Outil de serrage pour boulonnerie | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/11] | 27.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3125910 ; | [A]US2969250 (KULL FRANCIS R) |