EP0161130 - Volumetric screw compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENDIX France 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | [1985/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carré, Jean-Jacques 59 Boulevard de l'Est F-93340 Le Raincy / FR | 02 /
Levrai, Roland 9 bis Avenue Monmousseau F-93240 Stains / FR | [1988/09] |
Former [1985/46] | 01 /
Carré, Jean Jacques 59 Boulevard de l'Est F-93340 Le Raincy / FR | ||
02 /
Levrai, Roland 9 bis Avenue Monmousseau F-93240 Stains / FR | Representative(s) | Lejet, Christian, et al BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Lejet, Christian, et al BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1988/14] | Timoney, Ian Charles Craig Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1985/46] | Poidatz, Emmanuel Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400531.1 | 20.03.1985 | [1985/46] | Priority number, date | FR19840004841 | 28.03.1984 Original published format: FR 8404841 | [1985/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0161130 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161130 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/16 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
F04C18/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/46] | Title | German: | Verdrängungsschraubenverdichter | [1985/46] | English: | Volumetric screw compressor | [1985/46] | French: | Compresseur volumétrique à vis | [1985/46] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/46] | 25.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2287716 (WHITFIELD JOSEPH E); | [A]US2410172 (ALF LYSHOLM); | [A]CH325597 (DRESSER IND [US]); | [A]GB959833 (SVENSKA ROTOR MASKINER AB); | [A]DE1949175 (BORISOGLEBSKIJ ALEKSANDR I, et al) |