EP0161169 - Tree stump eradicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.09.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1992 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becker, André 54 rue Saint Vincent Bulligny F-54170 Colombey les Belles / FR | [1985/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/46] | Representative(s) | Poupon, Michel, et al Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17, avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | Poupon, Michel, et al B.P. 421 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot F-88011 Epinal Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1986/08] | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 F-75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | ||
Former [1985/46] | Bouju, André 38 Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400716.8 | 10.04.1985 | [1985/46] | Priority number, date | FR19840005900 | 13.04.1984 Original published format: FR 8405900 | [1985/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0161169 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161169 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0161169 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01G23/06 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
A01G23/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/46] | Title | German: | Stumpfrodegerät | [1985/46] | English: | Tree stump eradicator | [1985/46] | French: | Outil d'essouchement | [1985/46] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/46] | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.07.1988
01.08.1988
ADMISSIBLE Plaisance, Jean-Marie 3, Grande-Rue Montigny F-54540 Badonviller / FR Opponent's representative Aubertin, François c/o Cabinet Innovations et Prestations SA 4, rue de Haguenau 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.07.1988
01.08.1988
ADMISSIBLE Plaisance, Jean-Marie 3, Grande-Rue Montigny F-54540 Badonviller / FR Opponent's representative Aubertin, François c/o Cabinet Innovations et Prestations SA 4, rue de Haguenau F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 04.10.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.02.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.02.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 08.04.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 21.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.02.1992 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.02.1992 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.06.1992 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2966180 (BLES MARCUS J); | [X]US4094348 (WOLF ROBERT H) |