EP0165095 - Hydraulic antivibration mounting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.02.1993 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2 rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bodin, Francois 8, rue de la République Jallans F-28200 Chateaudun / FR | 02 /
Jouade, Pierre 21, rue du Mont Barry La Chapelle des Noyers F-28200 Chateaudun / FR | 03 /
Le Guillant, Daniel 1, rue du Val Saint-Aignan F-28200 Chateaudun / FR | [1985/51] | Representative(s) | Behaghel, Pierre, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84 rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | [1985/51] | Application number, filing date | 85400815.8 | 25.04.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | FR19840006986 | 04.05.1984 Original published format: FR 8406986 | [1985/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0165095 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0165095 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/00, B60K5/12 | [1985/51] | CPC: |
F16F13/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/51] | Title | German: | Hydraulisches Antischwingungslager | [1985/51] | English: | Hydraulic antivibration mounting | [1985/51] | French: | Support antivibratoire hydraulique | [1985/51] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 20.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.09.1988
10.10.1988
ADMISSIBLE Continental Gummi-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1 69 D-30001 Hannover / DE | [1988/44] | 12.10.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.02.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.02.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 21.04.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 02.12.1992 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/13] | 09.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 25.08.1989 | Appeal received No. T0562/89 | 21.11.1989 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.05.1991 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1991/18] | 28.06.1991 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1991/26] | 02.12.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 02.12.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.1992 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1993/23] | CH | 09.12.1987 | |
LI | 09.12.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2380899 (STRACHOVSKY NIKITA B); | [A]FR2155594 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]DE2514295 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]US4159091 (LE SALVER ROBERT [FR], et al); | [A]DE3016421 (PHOENIX AG [DE]); | [Y]DE8119912U (BOGE GMBH); | [Y]DE3239787 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0088682 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) |