EP0162778 - Instruction prefetch system for conditional branch instruction for central processor unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1985/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruckert, William F. 16 Edith Road Hudson Massachusetts / US | 02 /
Fossum, Tryggve 19 Increase Ward Drive Northboro Massachusetts / US | 03 /
De Rosa, John A., Jr. 16 Lovers Lane Princeton Massachusetts / US | 04 /
Glackemeyer, Richard E. 51 Nourse Road Bolton Massachusetts / US | 05 /
Helenius, Allan E. 19 Mark Vincent Westford Massachusetts / US | 06 /
Manton, John C. 112 Devon Court Street Marlboro Massachusetts / US | [1985/48] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1985/48] | Application number, filing date | 85400967.7 | 15.05.1985 | [1985/48] | Priority number, date | US19840612621 | 21.05.1984 Original published format: US 612621 | [1985/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0162778 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0162778 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162778 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38 | [1985/48] | CPC: |
G06F9/3804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/48] | Title | German: | Instruktionsvorgriffsystem für bedingte Sprungbefehle in einer zentralen Verarbeitungseinrichtung | [1985/48] | English: | Instruction prefetch system for conditional branch instruction for central processor unit | [1985/48] | French: | Système de recherche préalable d'instruction pour instructions de saut conditionnelles dans un processeur central | [1985/48] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 27.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.12.1992 | CH | 16.12.1992 | LI | 16.12.1992 | NL | 16.12.1992 | SE | 16.12.1992 | [1997/17] |
Former [1993/38] | BE | 16.12.1992 | |
CH | 16.12.1992 | ||
LI | 16.12.1992 | ||
NL | 16.12.1992 | ||
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/29] | CH | 16.12.1992 | |
LI | 16.12.1992 | ||
NL | 16.12.1992 | ||
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | CH | 16.12.1992 | |
LI | 16.12.1992 | ||
NL | 16.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | CH | 16.12.1992 | |
LI | 16.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2011682 (HONEYWELL INF SYSTEMS); | [A]FR2079020 (BURROUGHS CORP) | [X] - COMPUTER, vol. 17, no. 1, January 1984, pages 6-22, Long Beach, California, US; J.K.F. LEE et al.: "Branch prediction strategies and branch target buffer design" | Examination | US4236206 |