EP0169097 - Slide with a screw with a manual, electric or other drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. & M. Cousin et Cie Le Bois de Flers F-61103 Flers Cédex Orne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | For all designated states A. & M. Cousin et Cie Le Bois de Flers F-61103 Flers Cédex Orne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pipon, Yves La Garenne St Georges des Groseillers F-61100 Flers / FR | 02 /
Droulon, Georges Rue de la Garenne St Georges des Groseillers F-61100 Flers / FR | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Madeuf, Claude Alexandre Jean, et al CABINET MADEUF 3, avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | Madeuf, Claude Alexandre Jean, et al CABINET MADEUF 3, avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401117.8 | 06.06.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | FR19840009419 | 15.06.1984 Original published format: FR 8409419 | [1986/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169097 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169097 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/06, B60N2/08 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
B60N2/02246 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19637 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19819 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/04] | B60N1/02, B60N1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/04] | Title | German: | Gleitführung mit Schraube mit manuellem, elektrischem oder sonstigem Antrieb | [1986/04] | English: | Slide with a screw with a manual, electric or other drive | [1986/04] | French: | Glissière à vis, à commande manuelle, électrique ou autre | [1986/04] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1985 | Examination requested [1986/04] | 29.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1806014 (GERHARD FLINTERMANN); | [A]US2966069 (WISE RALPH H); | [A]US3184209 (COLAUTTI ALBERT J); | [A]US3223377 (BARTLETT ROBBINS SAMUEL); | [A]DE1755740 (C ROB HAMMERSEIN GMBH); | [A]GB1429616 (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB); | [A]DE2953871 (KEIPER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2510952 (KEIPER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3143122 (KEIPER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) |