EP0169117 - Rotary anode X-ray tube and method for mounting the rotary anode on a supporting axis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1989 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1989 [1989/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CGR 13, square Max-Hymans 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | For all designated states THOMSON-CGR 13, square Max-Hymans F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Penato, Jean-Marie THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld. Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Hery, Paul THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld. Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 03 /
Bouhnik, Claude THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld. Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Grynwald, Albert, et al THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | Grynwald, Albert, et al THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401213.5 | 18.06.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | FR19840010359 | 29.06.1984 Original published format: FR 8410359 | [1986/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169117 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169117 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/10 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
H01J35/1017 (EP,US);
H01J2235/1013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, NL [1986/04] | Title | German: | Drehanoden-Röntgenröhre und Verfahren zur Befestigung einer Drehanode auf einer Trägerachse | [1986/04] | English: | Rotary anode X-ray tube and method for mounting the rotary anode on a supporting axis | [1986/04] | French: | Tubes à rayons X à anode tournante, et procédé de fixation d'une anode tournante sur un axe support | [1986/04] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/32] | 20.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2344119 (PHILIPS NV [NL], et al); | [A]US3900751 (HOLLAND WILLIAM P, et al); | [A]FR2415366 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]GB2062953 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]EP0055828 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |