EP0172053 - Self-cleaning valve for powdery, granular and doughy products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS TROUVAY & CAUVIN Société Anonyme 58, rue Général Chanzy F-76600 Le Havre / FR | [1988/32] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS TROUVAY & CAUVIN Société Anonyme 58, rue Général Chanzy F-76600 Le Havre / FR | ||
For all designated states Morello, Aldo 18 bis, rue Creuze F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Besnard, Henri 8, Place du Général Leclerc F-76400 Fecamp / FR | 02 /
Fremau, Daniel Immeuble Ravel Parc de la Rivière Appartement 40 F-76400 Fecamp / FR | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Rodhain, Claude Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Rodhain, Claude Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401303.4 | 27.06.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | FR19840011042 | 11.07.1984 Original published format: FR 8411042 | [1986/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0172053 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0172053 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/316, F16K3/02 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
F16K3/0281 (EP,US);
F16K3/316 (EP,US);
Y10T137/4273 (EP,US);
Y10T137/4336 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | Selbstreinigende Ventile für pulverige, körnige und teigartige Produkte | [1986/08] | English: | Self-cleaning valve for powdery, granular and doughy products | [1986/08] | French: | Vanne auto-nettoyante pour produits poudreux, granuleux et pâteux | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 10.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1675986 (LYALL MASON HAROLD); | [A]FR1452707 (FMC CORP) | Examination | EP0048780 |