EP0173597 - Ether oxide derivatives of cyclopropyl phenols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Najer, Henri 2 avenue Emile Acollas F-75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states Giudicelli, François 17 rue du Clos d'Orléans F-94120 Fontenay-sous-Bois / FR | For all designated states Dufour, Jean-Claude 4 Rond-Point Saint-James F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1986/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/10] | Representative(s) | Combe, André, et al CABINET BEAU DE LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | Combe, André, et al CABINET BEAU DE LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401357.0 | 04.07.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | FR19840011271 | 13.07.1984 Original published format: FR 8411271 | [1986/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173597 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173597 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/22, A61K31/415 | [1986/10] | CPC: |
C07D233/22 (EP,US);
C07D233/00 (KR);
A61P27/16 (EP);
C07C37/045 (EP,US);
C07C39/17 (EP,US);
C07C39/42 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/045, C07C39/17 (EP,US);
C07C37/045, C07C39/42 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/10] | Title | German: | Ätheroxidderivate von Zyklopropylphenolen | [1986/10] | English: | Ether oxide derivatives of cyclopropyl phenols | [1986/10] | French: | Nouveaux éther-oxydes dérivés de cyclopropylphénols | [1986/10] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/45] | 09.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2394531 (SYNTHELABO [FR]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 13, 26 mars 1984, page 19, no. 96148m, Columbus, Ohio, US; K. DHARMSATHAPHORN et al.: "Effects of structure-activity relationships of alpha-adrenergic compounds on electrolyte transport in the rabbit ileum and rat colon", & GASTROENTEROLOGY 1984, 86(1), 120-8 |