EP0173607 - Needle bearing, especially a sleeve needle bearing with improved sealing means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NADELLA 61 route de Foecy F-18102 Vierzon Cédex / FR | [1986/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Labedan, Jean-Denis 157 rue Félix Pyat F-18100 Vierzon / FR | 02 /
Stephan, Gérard 41 avenue de Verdun F-78290 Croissy-Sur-Seine / FR | [1986/10] | Representative(s) | Bressand, Georges, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | Bressand, Georges, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401510.4 | 22.07.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | FR19840012083 | 30.07.1984 Original published format: FR 8412083 | [1986/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173607 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173607 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0173607 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/46, F16C33/78 | [1986/10] | CPC: |
F16C33/7809 (EP,US);
F16C19/44 (EP,US);
F16C33/7889 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/10] | Title | German: | Nadellager, insbesondere Hülsenadellager mit verstärkter Dichtung | [1986/10] | English: | Needle bearing, especially a sleeve needle bearing with improved sealing means | [1986/10] | French: | Roulement à aiguilles, notamment douille à aiguilles à étanchéité renforcée | [1986/10] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 13.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.09.1989
25.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 Postfach 1220 D-91063 Herzogenaurach / DE Opponent's representative Klug, Horst c/o INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG Postfach 12 20 91063 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.09.1989
25.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 Postfach 1220 D-91063 Herzogenaurach / DE Opponent's representative Klug, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) c/o INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG Postfach 12 20 D-91063 Herzogenaurach / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 07.11.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.02.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.02.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 27.04.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 16.07.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 15.12.1992 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.12.1992 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.06.1993 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 13.09.1991 | Appeal received No. T0706/91 | 15.10.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.03.1992 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [1992/10] | 23.05.1992 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/21] | 15.12.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 15.12.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.01.1993 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1942659 (FEDERAL MOGUL CORP); | [A]US3404926 (HORNE CHARLES E); | [A]FR2506869 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK [DE]) | by applicant | DE1942659 | US3404926 |