EP0169788 - Mounting structure of flat-lead package-type electronic component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1992 [1992/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/05] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Tsuyoshi Fujitsu Daiyon Ichigaoryo 12-33, Eda-cho Nishi 1-chome Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | 02 /
Okada, Nobuhide 31-8, Nagasawa 4-chome, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 214 / JP | 03 /
Kawamura, Yasuo 31-3, Sanda-cho 5-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | [1986/05] | Representative(s) | Descourtieux, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/05] | Descourtieux, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401518.7 | 23.07.1985 | [1986/05] | Priority number, date | JP19840153403 | 24.07.1984 Original published format: JP 15340384 | [1986/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0169788 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0169788 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169788 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/30 | [1986/05] | CPC: |
H05K3/3426 (EP,US);
H05K1/18 (KR);
H05K3/30 (EP,US);
H05K1/0271 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10689 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10757 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/05] | Title | German: | Montageanordnung für päckchenförmige elektronische Bauteile mit flachen Anschlussleitern | [1986/05] | English: | Mounting structure of flat-lead package-type electronic component | [1986/05] | French: | Dispositif de montage des composants électroniques en forme de paquet à connecteurs plats pour le raccordement | [1986/05] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 15.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0059337 (IBM [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 1, June 1983, page 206, New York, US; R.E. DARROW et al.: Module standoff" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 5, October 1983, page 2219, New York, US; J.D. GRIFFING et al.: "Printed circuit board component spacer" |