blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0175609

EP0175609 - Transdermal anaesthetic composition for topical use and process for its application [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Smith & Nephew PLC
Heron House
15 Adam Street
London WC2N 6LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
Smith & Nephew PLC
Heron House 15 Adam Street
London WC2N 6LA / GB
Former [1998/05]For all designated states
Smith & Nephew plc
2, Temple Place Victoria Embankment
London WC2R 3BP / GB
Former [1992/46]For all designated states
SMITH & NEPHEW plc
2 Temple Place Victoria Embankment
London WC2R 3BP / GB
Former [1986/13]For all designated states
SOCIETE D'ETUDES SCIENTIFIQUES ET INDUSTRIELLES DE L'ILE-DE-FRANCE
46, Boulevard de Latour-Maubourg
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Woolfson, David
7 Laral Gardens Comté Antrim
Newtownnabbeys Irlande du Nord / GB
02 / McCafferty, Dermot
50 Casaeldona Rise
Belfast Irlande du Nord / GB
[1986/13]
Representative(s)Gilholm, Stephen Philip, et al
Corporate Patents Department
Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre
York Science Park
Heslington
York YO1 5DF / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/45]Gilholm, Stephen Philip, et al
Corporate Patents Department Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park
Heslington York YO1 5DF / GB
Former [1992/46](deleted)
Former [1992/33]Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth
SYNTHELABO Service Brevets 22, avenue Galilée, B.P. Box 72
F-92352 LE PLESSIS ROBINSON CEDEX / FR
Former [1986/13]Gallochat, Alain
SOCIETE D'ETUDES SCIENTIFIQUES ET INDUSTRIELLES DE L'ILE DE FRANCE 46, Boulevard de Latour Maubourg
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date85401721.705.09.1985
[1986/13]
Priority number, dateGB1984002275908.09.1984         Original published format: GB 8422759
[1986/13]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0175609
Date:26.03.1986
Language:FR
[1986/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0175609
Date:28.01.1987
Language:FR
[1987/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0175609
Date:11.03.1992
Language:FR
[1992/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1986
ClassificationIPC:A61K47/00, A61K31/245
[1986/13]
CPC:
A61K9/0014 (EP); A61K9/06 (KR); A61K31/245 (EP);
A61K47/32 (EP); A61K47/38 (EP); A61P25/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/13]
TitleGerman:Transdermales Anästhetikum zur örtlichen Verwendung und Verfahren zu dessen Anwendung[1986/13]
English:Transdermal anaesthetic composition for topical use and process for its application[1986/13]
French:Composition anesthésique percutanée pour usage topique et procédé d'application[1986/13]
Examination procedure24.07.1987Examination requested  [1987/45]
30.03.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.09.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.1991Fee for grant paid
24.10.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.12.1992  29.01.1993  ADMISSIBLE
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol, et al, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2001/32]
Opponent(s)01  04.12.1992  29.01.1993  ADMISSIBLE
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol, et al, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A., 62 rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Former [1993/04]
Opponent(s)01  04.12.1992  29.01.1993  ADMISSIBLE
AB Astra
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
02.02.1993Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.06.1993Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.1994Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.03.1995Date of oral proceedings
14.06.1995Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.06.1995Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.10.2001Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/01]
25.10.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.08.1995Appeal received No.  T0682/95
06.11.1995Statement of grounds filed
19.12.2000Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [2000/52]
29.06.2001Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/26]
25.10.2001Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
25.10.2001Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2001Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
24.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.07.1987M02   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199107   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.1991
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU30.09.1992
[1999/52]
Documents cited:Search[X]US3337406  (DE MARCO PETER T, et al);
 [A]DE2413143  (RISCHSKIJ MEDICINSKIJ INST [SU], et al);
 [A]EP0002425  (ASTRA LAEKEMEDEL AB [SE]);
 [X]DE3234350  (HEMMANN ROLAND)
Examination   - "Pharmazeutische Stoffliste" 7 Auflage, Seite 94
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.