EP0177428 - Process for preparing directly compressible granular mannitol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roquette Frères 62136 Lestrem / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states Roquette Frères F-62136 Lestrem / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serpelloni, Michel 270, Boulevard Voltaire F-62400 Béthune / FR | 02 /
Lemay, Patrick 29, rue du Puits Richebourg F-62136 Lestrem / FR | [1988/33] |
Former [1986/15] | 01 /
Serpelloni, Michel 270, Boulevard Voltaire F-62400 Bethune / FR | ||
02 /
Lemay, Patrick 29, rue du Puits Richebourg F-62136 Lestrem / FR | Representative(s) | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401933.8 | 03.10.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | FR19840015212 | 03.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8415212 | [1986/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0177428 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177428 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/20, C07C31/26 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
C07C31/26 (KR);
B01J2/20 (EP,US);
C07C29/76 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/76, C07C31/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen von körnigem Mannitol, geeignet für direkte Komprimierung | [1986/15] | English: | Process for preparing directly compressible granular mannitol | [1986/15] | French: | Procédé de préparation de mannitol granulaire directement compressible | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/46] | 26.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2054599 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]EP0054868 (BAYER AG [DE]) |