EP0188925 - Method and arrangement for data transmission between moving vehicles on a road [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA TRANSPORT 2, rue Auguste Comte 92173 Vanves Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states MATRA TRANSPORT 2, rue Auguste Comte F-92173 Vanves Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mimoun, Samuel 2, rue Auguste Comte F-92170 Vanves / FR | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85402022.9 | 18.10.1985 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | FR19840015977 | 18.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8415977 | [1986/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0188925 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0188925 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B61L23/24, G08G1/16 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
G08G1/163 (EP,US);
B61L23/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1986/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Datenübertragung zwischen sich auf einem Weg versetzende Fahrzeuge | [1986/31] | English: | Method and arrangement for data transmission between moving vehicles on a road | [1986/31] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de transmission de données entre véhicules en déplacement sur une voie | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/49] | 26.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Request for further processing for: | 29.01.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2160885 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [A]GB1380587 (EMI LTD) | [A] - SIEMENS FORSCHUNGS & ENTWICKLUNGSBERICHTE, Band 7, Nr. 6, 1978, Seiten 374-377, Springer Verlag, Berlin, DE; H.J. LOHMANN: "Fail-safe data processing in railway signaling systems" | Examination | GB1286251 |