EP0181253 - Process for the catalytic hydrotreatment of heavy hydrocarbons in fixed or mobile beds with injection of a metal compound into the feed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plumail, Jean-Claude 60, rue Marc Mahon F-92000 Nanterre / FR | 02 /
Le Page, Jean-François 13, rue des Primevères F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | 03 /
Giuliani, Pierre 20, Boulevard du Maréchal Joffre F-38000 Grenoble / FR | [1988/33] |
Former [1986/20] | 01 /
Plumail, Jean-Claude 60, rue Marc Mahon F-92000 Nanterre / FR | ||
02 /
Le Page, Jean-François 13, rue des Primevères F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | |||
03 /
Giuliani, Pierre 20, Boulevard du Maréchal Joffre F-38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 85402042.7 | 22.10.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | FR19840016255 | 24.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8416255 | [1986/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181253 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181253 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C10G49/02, C10G47/12, B01J35/00 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
C10G49/02 (EP,US);
C10G49/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur katalytischen Wasserstoffbehandlung von schweren Kohlenwasserstoffen in festem oder bewegendem Bett mit Injektion einer Metallverbindung in die Ladung | [1986/20] | English: | Process for the catalytic hydrotreatment of heavy hydrocarbons in fixed or mobile beds with injection of a metal compound into the feed | [1986/20] | French: | Procédé d'hydrotraitement catalytique d'hydrocarbures lourds, en lit fixe ou mobile, avec injection d'un composé de metal dans la charge | [1986/20] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/32] | 26.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3169919 (GATSIS JOHN G, et al); | [Y]US3331769 (GATSIS JOHN G); | [A]FR91785E (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [AD]EP0098764 (CATALYSE SOC PROD FRANCAIS [FR]); | [A]US4430207 (KUKES SIMON G [US]); | [Y]EP0111912 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) | Examination | EP0028667 |