EP0181806 - Integrated circuit test clip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCAPEX 10 bis, quai Léon Blum F-92153 Suresnes / FR | [1986/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bricaud, Hervé THOMSON-CSF SCPI-173, bld Hausmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Tossuto, Jean-François THOMSON-CSF SCPI-173, bld Hausmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Hasenrader, Hubert Karl, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Hasenrader, Hubert, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1986/50] | Brullé, Jean Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1986/21] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Application number, filing date | 85402072.4 | 25.10.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | FR19840016596 | 30.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8416596 | [1986/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181806 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/073 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
G01R1/0425 (EP,US);
G01R1/073 (EP,US);
G01R1/07314 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1986/21] | Title | German: | Testklemme für integrierte Schaltungen | [1986/21] | English: | Integrated circuit test clip | [1986/21] | French: | Pince-test de circuit intégré | [1986/21] | File destroyed: | 17.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 12.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/03] | 02.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/35] | 04.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2117844 ; | [Y]GB1384550 (INT COMPUTERS LTD); | [A]DE3218491 (STEINBRUECK PETER [DE]); | [A]US3500288 (STARTIN KENNETH JOHN, et al); | [A]GB1246101 (ELECTROSIL LTD); | [A]FR2328199 (EVERETT CHARLES INC [US]); | [A]US4112363 (MORRISON ROBERT A, et al) |