EP0180523 - Process for zinc phosphate coating, activation and grain refining bath used in this process and concentrate therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE FRANCAISE DE PRODUITS INDUSTRIELS 28, Boulevard Camélinat F-92233 Gennevilliers / FR | [1986/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schapira, Joseph 32, rue Miollis F-75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
Ken, Victor 1 bis avenue Centrale F-92700 Colombes / FR | 03 /
Thery, Denis 17, rue des Martinets F-95170 Deuil La Barre / FR | 04 /
Jelodin, Stéphane 6, rue de Diane F-95100 Argenteuil / FR | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85402096.3 | 30.10.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | FR19840016725 | 31.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8416725 | [1986/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0180523 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180523 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/80 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
C23C22/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beschichtung mit Zinkphosphaten, Aktivierungs- und Schichtverfeinerungsbad für dieses Verfahren und Konzentrat dafür | [1986/19] | English: | Process for zinc phosphate coating, activation and grain refining bath used in this process and concentrate therefor | [1986/19] | French: | Procédé perfectionné de phosphatation au zinc, bain d'activation et d'affinage mis en oeuvre dans ce procédé et concentré correspondant | [1986/19] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/49] | 27.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3864139 (HELLER FERDINAND P); | [A]EP0031103 (COLLARDIN GMBH GERHARD [DE]); | [A]EP0091627 (COLLARDIN GMBH GERHARD [DE]); | [Y]DE3217145 (COLLARDIN GMBH GERHARD [DE]) |