EP0183590 - Perchlorofluorinated hydrocarbons and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boutevin, Bernard Les Terres Blanches 1, rue Anselme Mathieu F-34000 Montpellier / FR | 02 /
Hervaud, Yves 174, avenue de Lodève F-34000 Montpellier / FR | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | Leboulenger, Jean, et al Atofina D.C.R.D./D.P.I. 4, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris la Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | Leboulenger, Jean, et al ATOCHEM Département Propriété Industrielle F-92091 Paris la Défense 10 Cédex 42 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85402141.7 | 06.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | FR19840017278 | 13.11.1984 Original published format: FR 8417278 | [1986/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0183590 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183590 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C19/08, C07C17/26 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
C07C19/10 (EP,US);
C07C21/02 (KR);
C07C17/278 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/278, C07C19/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/23] | Title | German: | Perchlorofluorierte Kohlenwasserstoffe sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1986/23] | English: | Perchlorofluorinated hydrocarbons and process for their preparation | [1986/23] | French: | Hydrocarbures perchlorofluorés et leur procédé de préparation | [1986/23] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/23] | 05.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0140385 (OCCIDENTAL CHEM CO [US]) |