EP0188151 - Keyboard device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75761 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT, Société dite: 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75761 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbault, Patrick Jean-Pierre 94, rue Thiers F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02 /
Bosc, Jean-Jacques Alain Louis 7, rue Frédéric Chopin Res. "Les Peupliers" F-91380 Chilly-Mazarin / FR | [1986/30] | Representative(s) | Fabien, Henri PSA Peugeot Citroen Département OPS/BPI 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne-Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | Fabien, Henri PSA Peugeot Citroen Département OPS/BPI 18, rue des Fauvelles F-92250 La Garenne-Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 85402460.1 | 10.12.1985 | [1986/30] | Priority number, date | FR19840019514 | 20.12.1984 Original published format: FR 8419514 | [1986/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0188151 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0188151 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03M11/00 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
H03M11/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1986/30] | Title | German: | Tastensteuerungsvorrichtung | [1986/30] | English: | Keyboard device | [1986/30] | French: | Dispositif de commande par touches | [1986/30] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 17.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.01.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2815234 | [A] - ELEKTRONIK, vol. 27, no. 11, octobre 1978, page 112, Munich, DE; E. STEINER: "Tastaturanschluss" |