EP0155894 - Process for preparing sodium perborate monohydrate from sodium perborate tetrahydrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.03.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1985/39] | For all designated states ATOCHEM 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dugua, Jacques 241, Chemin des Flachères F-69390 Charly / FR | 02 /
Cuer, Jean Pierre 29 rue Bochu F-69340 Francheville-le-Haut / FR | [1987/37] |
Former [1985/39] | 01 /
Dugua, Jacques 241, Chemin des Flachères F-69390 Charly / FR | ||
02 /
Cuer, Jean Pierre 29 rue Bochu F-69340 Francheville le Haut / FR | Application number, filing date | 85420035.9 | 26.02.1985 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | FR19840003198 | 01.03.1984 Original published format: FR 8403198 | [1985/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0155894 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155894 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/12 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
C01B15/126 (EP,US);
C01B6/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Natriumperboratmonohydrat aus Natriumperboratetrahydrat | [1985/39] | English: | Process for preparing sodium perborate monohydrate from sodium perborate tetrahydrate | [1985/39] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de perborate de sodium monohydraté à partir de perborate de sodium tétrahydraté | [1985/39] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/39] | 20.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.1988
31.10.1988
ADMISSIBLE INTEROX, S.A. 33, rue du Prince Albert B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Lederer, Franz Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.1988
31.10.1988
ADMISSIBLE INTEROX, S.A. 33, rue du Prince Albert B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Lederer, Franz, Dr. Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1988
INTEROX, S.A. 33, rue du Prince Albert B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Lederer, Franz, Dr. Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | 04.11.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.03.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.03.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 17.05.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.1990 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 29.11.1990 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1991/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE268814 ; | [A]DE299410 ; | [A]DE548432 (DEGUSSA) |