Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0156747
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.03.1989 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] |
10.02.1989 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.1989 [1989/13] |
09.04.1988 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.05.1988 [1988/21] |
20.11.1987 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] |
20.11.1987 |
Change - representative |
published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] |
11.02.1987 |
First examination report |
|
20.02.1986 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.04.1986 [1986/15] |
02.08.1985 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.10.1985 [1985/40] |