Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE34535T | 15.06.1988 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR8405113 | 22.03.1984 | EP85420055 | 22.03.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0156747 | Global Dossier | 25.05.1988 | B1 | EP0156747 | 02.10.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8405113 | 22.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3562876D1 | 30.06.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8405113 | 22.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2561567 | 07.04.1989 | B1 | FR2561567 | 27.09.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8405113 | 22.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4641556 | 10.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8405113 | 22.03.1984 |