EP0169153 - Fluid circulation detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.1987 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boiteux, Jean-Pierre Les Grands-Prés Sergy F-01630 Saint Genis Pouilly / FR | [1986/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [1986/04] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau Le Britannia - Tour C 20, bld Eugène Déruelle Boîte Postale 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85420121.7 | 02.07.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | FR19840010652 | 02.07.1984 Original published format: FR 8410652 | [1986/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169153 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01P13/00 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
G01P13/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/04] | Title | German: | Strömungsdetektor | [1986/04] | English: | Fluid circulation detector | [1986/04] | French: | Détecteur de circulation d'un fluide | [1986/04] | File destroyed: | 23.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 03.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/11] | 31.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE1252299 ; | [A]US3549839 |