EP0176452 - Device for supporting and orientating various elements in relation to a reference plane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1989 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac F-75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cathignol, Dominique 14, rue du Fort F-69740 Genas / FR | 02 /
Chapelon, Jean-Yves 6, allée M. Achard F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 03 /
Devonec, Marian 81, avenue des Balmes F-01700 Miribel / FR | [1986/14] | Representative(s) | Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude, et al Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude, et al Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 7073 F-69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85420152.2 | 20.08.1985 | [1986/14] | Priority number, date | FR19840013235 | 22.08.1984 Original published format: FR 8413235 | [1986/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176452 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176452 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16M13/00 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
A61B10/02 (EP);
F16M11/043 (EP);
F16M11/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1986/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Tragen und zur verstellbaren Orientierung von verschiedenen Elementen bezüglich einer Referenzebene | [1986/14] | English: | Device for supporting and orientating various elements in relation to a reference plane | [1986/14] | French: | Dispositif de support et de réglage en orientation d'organes divers par rapport à un plan de référence | [1986/14] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/29] | 24.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4068655 ; | [A]US3212497 ; | [A]US3762404 ; | [A]FR2156966 |