EP0184524 - Machine for packaging products in a heat-shrinkable film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raffault, Gérard "Les Carrières" Lucenay 69480 Anse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states Raffault, Gérard "Les Carrières" Lucenay F-69480 Anse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/24] | Representative(s) | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | [1986/24] | Application number, filing date | 85420200.9 | 08.11.1985 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | FR19840017992 | 15.11.1984 Original published format: FR 8417992 | [1986/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0184524 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184524 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/06, B65B53/06 | [1986/24] | CPC: |
B65B53/066 (EP,US);
B65B9/073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/24] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Verpacken von Waren in einer wärmeschrumpfbaren Folie | [1986/24] | English: | Machine for packaging products in a heat-shrinkable film | [1986/24] | French: | Machine pour emballer des produits sous film thermorétractable | [1986/24] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 07.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.04.1988 | CH | 30.11.1988 | LI | 30.11.1988 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 06.04.1988 | |
CH | 30.11.1988 | ||
LI | 30.11.1988 | ||
Former [1990/04] | CH | 30.11.1988 | |
LI | 30.11.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2397329 (SOCEMIM SA [FR]); | [AD]US4162604 (BARTOLOMEI GIUSEPPE [BR]); | [A]FR2278962 (HURDEQUINT LOUIS [FR]); | [A]US3420034 (SARAISKY ALFRED B, et al) |