EP0161998 - Machine for sawing the contours of plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 15.11.1989 [1989/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMID S.A., Société Anonyme dite: 54, rue Poincaré F-68460 Lutterbach / FR | [1985/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erhard, Raymond 6, rue de la Carrière F-68760 Willer-Sur-Thur / FR | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Aubertin, François c/o Cabinet Innovations et Prestations SA 4, rue de Haguenau 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Aubertin, François c/o Cabinet Innovations et Prestations SA 4, rue de Haguenau F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 85440010.8 | 15.02.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | FR19840002636 | 17.02.1984 Original published format: FR 8402636 | [1985/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0161998 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161998 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B23D47/04, B23Q1/14, B23Q16/02 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
B23Q1/4804 (EP,US);
B23D47/042 (EP,US);
B23D59/001 (EP,US);
B23Q16/06 (EP,US);
B23Q7/18 (EP,US);
H05K3/0044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/47] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Sägen von Plattenumrissen | [1985/47] | English: | Machine for sawing the contours of plates | [1985/47] | French: | Machine à scier les contours de plaques | [1985/47] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/25] | 26.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.09.1988 | SE | 07.09.1988 | [1989/46] |
Former [1989/24] | SE | 07.09.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3054224 (HENSLEY JAMES L); | [A]DE1172929 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]US3158920 (BOLLMAN RALPH R); | [A]GB1030262 (PHILIPS BROS & ELLIS LTD); | [A]AT354720B (RUDOLF SCHOLZE FA ING [AT], et al) | [A] - LA MACHINE MODERNE, volume 57, novembre 1963, pages 21-22, Paris, FR; A.N. RABINOVITCH: "Automatisation des procédés de fabrication en construction mécanique" | Examination | FR2182891 |