Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0195873


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.1990 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.10.1990 [1990/42]
23.09.1989 (Expected) grant published on  08.11.1989 [1989/45]
11.02.1988 First examination report
27.04.1987 Change - representative published on  16.06.1987 [1987/25]
10.10.1986 Change - designated states published on  26.11.1986 [1986/48]
15.08.1986 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.1986 [1986/40]
15.08.1986 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.1986 [1986/40]