blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0195873

EP0195873 - A method of forming a colour graduated picture from a black-white graduated picture and in particular a method of producing a colour graduated isobar representation of a pressure distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.1990
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.10.1990 [1990/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
1144 East Market Street
Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/40]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street
Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Breedijk, Frans N.
14, rue du Cimetière
L-7396 Hunsdore / LU
[1986/40]
Representative(s)Weyland, J.J. Pierre
Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
[N/P]
Former [1986/40]Weyland, J.J. Pierre
Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg
L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
Application number, filing date85630040.528.03.1985
[1986/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0195873
Date:01.10.1986
Language:EN
[1986/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0195873
Date:08.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.1986
ClassificationIPC:G01L1/24, G01L11/00
[1986/40]
CPC:
G01L1/247 (EP); G01L17/005 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1986/48]
Former [1986/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bildung eines farbabgestuften Bildes von einem Schwarz-weiss abgestuften Bild, und insbesondere Verfahren zur Herstellung einer farbgestuften isobaren Darstellung einer Druckverteilung[1986/40]
English:A method of forming a colour graduated picture from a black-white graduated picture and in particular a method of producing a colour graduated isobar representation of a pressure distribution[1986/40]
French:Méthode pour former une image graduée en couleur d'une image graduée en noir et blanc et méthode spéciale de production d'une représentation isobare graduée en couleur d'une répartition de la compression[1986/40]
Examination procedure20.04.1985Examination requested  [1986/40]
29.05.1986Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.06.1986Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LU, NL, SE
08.02.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.10.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.05.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.1989Fee for grant paid
31.07.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.03.1986AT   M02   Not yet paid
28.03.1986BE   M02   Not yet paid
28.03.1986CH   M02   Not yet paid
28.03.1986LU   M02   Not yet paid
28.03.1986NL   M02   Not yet paid
28.03.1986SE   M02   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.198703   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.1987
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP57137829  ;
 [Y]FR2504706  ;
 [Y]EP0121904  ;
 [A]US4104910  ;
 [A]DE2513526  ;
 [A]DE2642609  ;
 [A]DE2305816
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 237 (P-157)[1115], 25th November 1982; & JP - A - 57 137 829 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO et al.) 25-08-1982, & JP57137829 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.