EP0175631 - Integrated digital network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATA GENERAL CORPORATION 4400 Computer Drive Westboro Massachusetts 01580 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | For all designated states DATA GENERAL CORPORATION 4400 Computer Drive Westboro Massachusetts 01580 / US | ||
Former [1986/13] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellamy, John Carey 141 Meadowcreek Coppel Texas 75019 / US | [1986/13] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 85630061.1 | 18.04.1985 | [1986/13] | Priority number, date | US19840604093 | 26.04.1984 Original published format: US 604093 | [1986/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0175631 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0175631 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0175631 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04M11/06 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0428 (EP,US);
H04L5/1492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/13] | Title | German: | Integriertes Nachrichtennetz | [1986/13] | English: | Integrated digital network | [1986/13] | French: | Réseau numérique à intégration | [1986/13] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 24.02.1993 | FR | 24.02.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1994/23] | DE | 24.02.1993 | |
FR | 16.07.1993 | ||
Former [1993/40] | DE | 24.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2004440 (WESCOM SWITCHING); | [E]US4551832 (CARLL RICHARD T [US], et al) | [X] - INTERNATIONAL ZÜRICH SEMINAR ON DIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, Zürich, 7th-9th March 1978, pages 1-6, IEEE; H.G. ALLES: "An intelligent network processor for a digital central office" | [X] - INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM, Paris, 7th-11th May 1979, session 22A, pages 419-426; R. SCHELLER et al.: "A local PCM switching system for voice and data" | [A] - JAPAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS REVIEW, vol. 23, no. 1, January 1981, pages 35-45, Tokyo, JP; K. OKIMI et al.: "Digital terminals in a synchronous network" |