EP0160615 - Top wire former [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELOIT CORPORATION P.O. Box 350 Beloit Wisconsin 53511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | For all designated states BELOIT CORPORATION P.O. Box 350 Beloit Wisconsin 53511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brauns, Robert Alan Rt. 1 Foxhollow Clinton Wisconsin / US | 02 /
Rempel, Cornelius 2722 Nakoma Ct. Beloit Wisconsin / US | [1985/45] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer, John James, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, Rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | Dennemeyer, John James, et al DENNEMEYER & ASSOCIATES Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/45] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 85630073.6 | 02.05.1985 | [1985/45] | Priority number, date | US19840606995 | 03.05.1984 Original published format: US 606995 | [1985/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0160615 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0160615 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D21F9/00 | [1985/45] | CPC: |
D21F9/003 (EP);
D21F9/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/45] | Title | German: | Doppelsieb-Formerpartie | [1985/45] | English: | Top wire former | [1985/45] | French: | Section de formage à double toile | [1985/45] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 10.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/19] | 06.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.11.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/22] | 21.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2072936 (WALMSLEYS BURY LTD); | [A]DE3100713 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB1346385 (VALMET OY); | [AP]AT375695B (ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]); | [AP]EP0136000 (BELOIT WALMSLEY LTD [GB]); | [A]DE3131957 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]) |