EP0172129 - A flexible damped bearing assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.10.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY, INC. North Fourth Street Jeannette Pennsylvania 15644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY, INC. North Fourth Street Jeannette Pennsylvania 15644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jensen, Richard Christian 806 Brookview Drive Greensburg Pennsylvania 15601 / US | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 85630124.7 | 01.08.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | US19840640893 | 14.08.1984 Original published format: US 640893 | [1986/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0172129 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16C27/00, F01D25/16 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
F01D25/164 (EP,US);
F16C27/02 (EP,US);
F16C17/02 (EP,US);
F16C2360/00 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, IT, LI, NL [1986/08] | Title | German: | Flexibler gedämpfter Lageraufbau | [1986/08] | English: | A flexible damped bearing assembly | [1986/08] | French: | Palier élastique amorti | [1986/08] | File destroyed: | 17.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 27.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.04.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/48] | 30.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1988/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3950964 (ALEXEEVA NATALIA ILINICHNA, et al); | [A]EP0064251 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US3639014 (SIXSMITH HERBERT); | [A]FR2255510 (MAAG ZAHNRAEDER & MASCHINEN AG [CH]); | [AP]US3979155 (SOOD VIJAY K, et al) |