EP0183640 - Device for measuring pressure differences using a semiconductor pressure sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Rauch, Moriz, Ing. grad. Kiefernweg 3 D-1000 Berlin 19 / DE | [1986/23] | Application number, filing date | 85730152.7 | 18.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | DE19843443419 | 26.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3443419 | [1986/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0183640 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/06, G01L13/02 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
G01L19/0038 (EP,US);
G01L13/025 (EP,US);
G01L19/0645 (EP,US);
Y10S73/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/23] | Title | German: | Druckdifferenz-Messgerät mit einem Halbleiter-Drucksensor | [1986/23] | English: | Device for measuring pressure differences using a semiconductor pressure sensor | [1986/23] | French: | Appareil de mesure d'une pression différentielle, comportant un élément semi-conducteur sensible à la pression | [1986/23] | File destroyed: | 24.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/32] | 04.03.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1558770 (BELL & HOWELL LTD); | [A]GB2086587 (TELTOV GERAETE REGLER); | [A]GB2091883 (SKIL CONTROLS LTD); | [A]US4452069 (HATTORI TADASHI [JP], et al) |