Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU570394B | Global Dossier | 10.03.1988 | B2 | AU5031785 | 05.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3443419 | 26.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0183640 | Global Dossier | 04.06.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3443419 | 26.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3443419 | 28.05.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3443419 | 26.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8609706 | 16.07.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3443419 | 26.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI854649 | 27.05.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3443419 | 26.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN162349 | 07.05.1988 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3443419 | 26.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS61130839 | 18.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3443419 | 26.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO854351L | 27.05.1986 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3443419 | 26.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4637257 | 20.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3443419 | 26.11.1984 |